Global Patent Index - EP 0985460 A2

EP 0985460 A2 2000-03-15 - Rolling machine with rapid exchange of working rolls

Title (en)

Rolling machine with rapid exchange of working rolls

Title (de)

Walzmaschine mit Schnellaustausch von Arbeitswalzen

Title (fr)

Machine à laminer avec échange rapide des cylindres de travail

Publication

EP 0985460 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116220 A

Priority

CZ 846298 A

Abstract (en)

The front parts of the pegs (7, 8) of the working rolls (1) of a rolling machine are provided with projections (9, 10) that grip the corresponding opposite front nuts (11, 12) arranged in off-center bearing journals (2, 3). The zones of contact are covered by axially moving rings (13).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Walzmaschine mit Schnellaustausch von Arbeitswalzen (1) von der Befestigung deren Zapfen (7, 8)in den tragenden seitlichen Lagerzapfen (2, 3), die in Maschinenrahmen (4) angeordnet sind, von denen jeweils einer mittels Getriebe (5) mit dem Hauptantrieb (6) der Maschine verbunden ist. Das Problem des Schnellaustausches von Arbeitswalzen (1) ist dadurch gelöst, daß die Stirne der Zapfen (7, 8) der Arbeitswalzen (1) mit nicht durchlaufenden Stirnfedern (9, 10) versehen sind, die in korrespondierende gegenüberliegende nicht durchlaufende Stirnnuten (11, 12) in seitlichen Lagerzapfen (2, 3) eingreifen, wobei die Zonen deren Eingriffkontaktes durch axial verschiebbare Ringe (13) radial überdeckt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 31/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985460 A2 20000315; EP 0985460 A3 20020502; EP 0985460 B1 20030709; DE 59906242 D1 20030814; ES 2172491 T1 20021001; ES 2172491 T3 20040401

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050818

2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-08-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050817

2004-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040930

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040826

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040819

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2172491

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906242

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2003-01-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT

2002-10-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BA2A

- Ref Document Number: 2172491

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T1

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI