Global Patent Index - EP 0985464 A1

EP 0985464 A1 2000-03-15 - Straightening installation for vehicle bodies with peripheral horizontal holes

Title (en)

Straightening installation for vehicle bodies with peripheral horizontal holes

Title (de)

Richtvorrichtung zum Richten von Fahrzeugkarosserien mit horizontale Peripheriebohrungen

Title (fr)

Banc de redressage pour carrosseries automobiles ayant des perçages périphériques horizontaux

Publication

EP 0985464 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402232 A

Priority

FR 9811371 A

Abstract (en)

The horizontal rectangular frame (1) is made from lengthwise members (2) joined rigidly by cross-members (3, 4), and it has a series of horizontal holes (6-9) at least in the middle sections of the lengthwise members for fitting auxiliary equipment such as a traction assembly. The lengthwise members of the frame are hollow and have the holes in their vertical outer walls, the holes being equally-spaced or closer together in the middle sections.

Abstract (fr)

Banc de redressage pour carrosseries automobiles comprenant un cadre horizontal rectangulaire (1) formé de longerons (2) reliés rigidement par des traverses (3, 4), caractérisé en ce que ce cadre est muni d'une pluralité de perçages horizontaux (6, 7, 8, 9) dans au moins une portion médiane de chaque longeron. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 1/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0765699 A1 19970402 - BLACKHAWK SA [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985464 A1 20000315; FR 2783183 A1 20000317; FR 2783183 B1 20010119

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030218

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021007

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000714

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI