Global Patent Index - EP 0985472 A1

EP 0985472 A1 2000-03-15 - Method for operating a horizontal strip casting machine

Title (en)

Method for operating a horizontal strip casting machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Horizontal-Bandgiessanlage

Title (fr)

Procédé de fonctionnement d'une installation de coulée de bandes

Publication

EP 0985472 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116714 A

Priority

DE 19841116 A

Abstract (en)

Process for optimizing the operation of a horizontal continuous casting plant (1) comprises controlling the speed of the metal strip (2), the amount of cooling water for the mold (4), the withdrawal parameters and the melting temperature in the oven (3) depending on the determined temperature profile. Process for optimizing the operation of a horizontal continuous casting plant (1) comprises continuously scanning each longitudinal section of a metal strip (2) directly after the exit from a mold (4) arranged in an oven (3) over the whole width (B) using an IR scanner, and feeding the temperature values to a computer (10), in which a graphical diagram graduated according to color and/or a temperature profile diagram (18) is prepared over the width of the metal strip and displaying on at least one screen (11). The speed of the metal strip (2), the amount of cooling water for the mold (4), the withdrawal parameters and the melting temperature in the oven (3) depending on the determined temperature profile is controlled.

Abstract (de)

Beim Betrieb der Horizontal-Bandgießanlage (1) wird jeder Längenabschnitt eines Metallbands (2) unmittelbar nach dem Austritt aus einer einem Ofen (3) zugeordneten Kokille (4) über die gesamte Breite des Metallbands (2) mit einem Infrarot-Scanner (8) kontinuierlich fächerförmig abgetastet. Dieser leitet unter Berücksichtigung der parametrierten Emissionsfaktoren die beim Scannen ermittelten Temperaturwerte an einen Rechner (10) weiter. In dem Rechner (10) werden auf der Basis der Temperaturwerte ein nach Farben gestaffeltes grafisches Diagramm und/oder ein Temperaturprofildiagramm mit der Darstellung der Temperatur über der Breite des Metallbands (2) erstellt und auf mindestens einem Bildschirm (11) visualisiert. In Abhängigkeit von dem ermittelten Temperaturprofil werden dann die Geschwindigkeit des Metallbands (2), die Kühlwassermengen für die Kokille (4), die Abziehparameter und die Schmelzetemperatur im Ofen (3) gesteuert. Zu diesem Zweck ist der Rechner (10) mit einer speicherprogrammierbaren Steuerung (12) gekoppelt, die ihrerseits wiederum mit einer Abzieheinheit (5) und einer Einrolleinheit zum Wickeln des Metallbands (2) verbunden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/16; B22D 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/14 (2006.01); B22D 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/16 (2013.01); B22D 11/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4306610 A 19811222 - AHMED AZIZ
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 452 (M - 1180) 18 November 1991 (1991-11-18)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 08 30 June 1998 (1998-06-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 005, no. 139 (M - 086) 3 September 1981 (1981-09-03)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 004, no. 187 (M - 048) 23 December 1980 (1980-12-23)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985472 A1 20000315; EP 0985472 B1 20040407; AT 263646 T 20040415; CN 1196550 C 20050413; CN 1250698 A 20000419; DE 19841116 A1 20000316; DK 0985472 T3 20040809; ES 2218911 T3 20041116; HK 1026173 A1 20051028; HU 222002 B1 20030328; HU 9903035 A1 20000628; HU 9903035 D0 19991129; KR 100611082 B1 20060810; KR 20000022937 A 20000425; PL 190066 B1 20051031; PL 335321 A1 20000313; PT 985472 E 20040831; TW 450851 B 20010821; US 6450239 B1 20020917

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170227

2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150827

2016-09-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160926

2016-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150826

2016-07-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150826

2016-06-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2016-06-17 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20040402177

- Effective date: 20160303

2016-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-06-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150826

2016-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150827

2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150826

2016-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160303

2016-05-04 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150901

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150826

2016-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150826

2016-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 263646 T

- Effective date: 20150826

2016-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-03-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-03-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909093

2015-10-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150805

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141031

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140825

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140826

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140826

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140829

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140926

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140828

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20140828

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140826

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140822

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140826

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20140825

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140822

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: KME GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Document: AT 263646 T

- Effective date: 20140219

2013-11-29 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KME GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Effective date: 20131029

2013-10-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: KME GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20131004

2013-09-04 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130828

2013-09-04 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130828

2013-08-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: KME GERMANY G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20130829

2013-08-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: KME GERMANY G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20130829

2013-08-27 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: KME GERMANY AG & CO. KG, DE

- Effective date: 20130821

2013-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: KME GERMANY GMBH AND CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KME GERMANY AG, DE

2013-03-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KME GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KME GERMANY AG & CO. KG, 49074 OSNABRUECK, DE

- Document: DE 59909093

- Effective date: 20130122

2013-03-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909093

- Representative's name: PIETRZYKOWSKI, ANJA, DE

- Effective date: 20130122

2013-01-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909093

- Representative's name: PIETRZYKOWSKI, ANJA, DE

2010-05-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2010-05-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-09-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT;BRENDENWEG 11 POSTFACH 154;9424 RHEINECK (CH)

2007-07-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KME GERMANY AG

- Free text: KM EUROPA METAL AG#KLOSTERSTRASSE 29#49074 OSNABRUECK (DE) -TRANSFER TO- KME GERMANY AG#KLOSTERSTRASSE 29#49074 OSNABRUECK (DE)

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2218911 T3

2004-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-08-26 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040826

2004-08-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-07-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040402177

2004-07-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040513

2004-05-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909093 P 20040513

2004-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-07 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2003-09-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR OPERATING A HORIZONTAL STRIP CASTING MACHINE

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021125

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI