Global Patent Index - EP 0985473 A1

EP 0985473 A1 2000-03-15 - Pressure diecasting machine and process for making die castings

Title (en)

Pressure diecasting machine and process for making die castings

Title (de)

Druckgiessmaschine und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Druckgussteilen

Title (fr)

Machine à couler sous pression et procédé pour la fabrication de pièces coulées sous pression

Publication

EP 0985473 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117338 A

Priority

DE 19841229 A

Abstract (en)

Pressure casting machine for light metal casting has an evacuated mold made of two halves (18, 22). Continuous oxygen is applied under pressure or somewhat above atmospheric pressure to all intermediate chambers (56, 62) and all separating surfaces (58, 64) within the mold irrespective of the geometric structure via channels (48). An Independent claim is also included for a process for the production of pressure cast parts comprising closing the mold halves (18, 22) with simultaneous evacuation of the space inside and applying oxygen under pressure or somewhat above atmospheric pressure to all intermediate chambers (56, 62) and all separating surfaces (58, 64) within the mold irrespective of the geometric structure via channels (48), injecting liquid metal into the mold, opening the mold halves and evaluating the cast part under continuing oxygen application, and repeating the above steps.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Druckgießmaschine 10, insbesondere für den Leichtmetallguß in einer evakuierten Form, wobei die Form aus zwei zwei Formhälften 18, 22 besteht. Erfindungsgemäß wird an alle Zwischenräume 56, 62 und an alle Trennflächen 58, 64 innerhalb der Form 18, 22, gleichgültig in welcher geometrischen Gestalt oder ob beweglich oder unbeweglich miteinander verbunden, über Kanäle 48 in der Form ständig Sauerstoff unter Druck etwas oberhalb des atmosphärischen Drucks angelegt. Die Erfindung betrifft weiterhin ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von Druckgußteilen, insbesondere für den Leichtmetallguß in einer evakuierten Form. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 17/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985473 A1 20000315; DE 19841229 A1 20000316

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020205

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010924

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI