Global Patent Index - EP 0985529 A3

EP 0985529 A3 2000-06-28 - Method and device for emptying a wedge ink duct

Title (en)

Method and device for emptying a wedge ink duct

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Entleerung eines Keilfarbkastens

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour vider un bac d'encrage à coins

Publication

EP 0985529 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99115128 A

Priority

DE 19841129 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0985529A2] When the ink gap is opened the duct roller (2) is turned against the printing operation rotary direction into the emptying direction and the ink is moved out of the ink duct (1) and scraped away by a doctor blade (11) adjoining the duct roller and returned to an ink reservoir (14). Independent claim describes emptying device where the duct roller is associated with its own drive (6) which can be switched between rotary directions. The ink reservoir can be removed with the ink doctor blade after the ink moving process

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/20; B41F 31/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/04 (2006.01); B41F 31/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/04 (2013.01); B41F 31/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985529 A2 20000315; EP 0985529 A3 20000628; EP 0985529 B1 20030502; DE 19841129 A1 20000316; DE 19841129 C2 20030731

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090914

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100810

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905294

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100810

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100810

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-02-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905294 P 20030605

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010312

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI