Global patent index - EP 0985530 A2

EP 0985530 A2 2000-03-15 - Ink unit having an ink forme roller for a reduction of the mottling ink

Title (en)

Ink unit having an ink forme roller for a reduction of the mottling ink

Title (de)

Farbwerk in einer Rotations-Offsetdruckmaschine mit einer Farbauftragswalze zur Verringerung des Pereffektes der Druckfarbe

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'encrage comprenant un rouleau tocheur-encreur pour la réduction de l'encre moutonnant

Publication

EP 0985530 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114183 A

Priority

US 13156498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19934395A1] The inking unit has an inking roller with an inner core (30) and outer layer (21). The outer layer has a shore hardness between 50 Shore A and 100 Shore A, preferably 80 Shore A . The outer surface of the outer layer can have a convex shape along its axial length. The outer layer can contain an elastomer such as rubber. The inner core can be hollow.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Farbwerk zum Verringern des Perlens der Farbfeststoffe in Offsetdruckmaschinen. Eine oder mehrere Farbauftragswalzen (F1, F2 oder F3) mit einer harten Außenschicht (21) aus einem Elastomer, deren Härte zwischen ca. 50 und 100 Shore A, vorzugsweise zwischen 60 und 90 Shore A beträgt, übertragen Farbe auf den Plattenzylinder (P). Durch den Einsatz einer Farbauftragswalze (F1, F2 oder F3) dieser Art wird ein gleichmäßigerer Farbauftrag auf den Plattenzylinder, von dort auf den Gummituchzylinder und von diesem auf die zu bedruckende Bahn ermöglicht. Ist mehr als eine Farbauftragswalze (F1, F2 oder F3) vorgesehen, ist vorzugsweise mindestens die in Drehrichtung des Plattenzylinders letzte Farbauftragswalze (F3) eine Farbauftragswalze mit harter Außenschicht (21) aus einem Elastomer. Ein weiterer Aspekt der vorliegenden Erfindung besteht darin, daß die Farbauftragswalzen (F1, F2 oder F3) entlang ihrer axialen Länge eine konvexe Form aufweisen, so daß der Durchmesser (d2) in der axialen Mitte größer ist als der Durchmesser (d1) an den Enden der Farbauftragswalzen (F1, F2 oder F3), so daß ein korrekter Kontakt zwischen der Farbauftragswalze (F1, F2 oder F3) und dem Plattenzylinder gewährleistet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/26; B41N 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 29/38 (2006.01); B41F 31/26 (2006.01); B41J 29/00 (2006.01); B41N 7/06 (2006.01); G03G 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19934395 A1 20000217; DE 19934395 B4 20121108; CN 1131780 C 20031224; CN 1244462 A 20000216; DE 59907097 D1 20031030; EP 0985530 A2 20000315; EP 0985530 A3 20001004; EP 0985530 B1 20030924; EP 0985530 B2 20090114; HK 1023095 A1 20040924; JP 2000052625 A 20000222; US 6098540 A 20000808

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150729

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150331

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130717

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110722

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110722

2012-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2009-01-14 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20090114

2009-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2005-11-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2005-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2004-11-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GOSS INTERNATIONAL AMERICAS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-11-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-08-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: KBA KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, -LIZEN

- Effective date: 20040623

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031118

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-09-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001016

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI