Global Patent Index - EP 0985535 A2

EP 0985535 A2 2000-03-15 - Ink jet recording head and ink jet recording apparatus comprising the same

Title (en)

Ink jet recording head and ink jet recording apparatus comprising the same

Title (de)

Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungskopf und diesen enthaltendes Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsgerät

Title (fr)

Tête d'enregistrement à jet d'encre et appareil d'enregistrement à jet d'encre comprenant cette tête

Publication

EP 0985535 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99116295 A

Priority

  • JP 23524998 A
  • JP 23982598 A
  • JP 29977998 A
  • JP 3459299 A
  • JP 22206299 A

Abstract (en)

An ink jet recording head comprises a nozzle forming member (16) provided with a plurality of nozzle orifices (15) for jetting ink, a channel forming substrate (10) provided with a plurality of pressure generating chambers (12) communicated with the associated nozzle orifices (15), one face of which is bonded to the nozzle forming member (16), a plurality of piezoelectric elements (70) provided on an face of the channel forming substrate (10) which is opposed to the face bonded to the nozzle forming substrate (16) for causing pressure change to occur in the associated pressure generating chambers (12), and a reservoir forming member (20) bonded to the face of the channel forming substrate (10) on which the piezoelectric elements (70) are provided, the reservoir forming member (20) having a reservoir section (21) forming at least a part of a reservoir communicated with the pressure generating chambers (12) for supplying ink thereto and a piezoelectric element holding section (24) for defining a space in an area facing the piezoelectric elements (70) such an extent that motion of the respective piezoelectric elements (70) is exhibited while sealing the space hermetically. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14233 (2013.01); B41J 2/161 (2013.01); B41J 2/1623 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14241 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14419 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14491 (2013.01); B41J 2202/03 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985535 A2 20000315; EP 0985535 A3 20010829; EP 0985535 B1 20040609; AT 268693 T 20040615; AT 295265 T 20050515; DE 69917849 D1 20040715; DE 69917849 T2 20041007; DE 69925318 D1 20050616; DE 69925318 T2 20051006; EP 1277583 A2 20030122; EP 1277583 A3 20030305; EP 1277583 B1 20050511; JP 2000296616 A 20001024; JP 3422364 B2 20030630

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160817

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160809

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041109

2005-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-06-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-03-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-09-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-09-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040909

2004-09-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040909

2004-09-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040909

2004-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-08-18 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69917849 P 20040715

2004-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-06-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-06-09 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-06-09 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-06-09 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-06-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-06-09 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-06-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI