Global Patent Index - EP 0985543 A2

EP 0985543 A2 2000-03-15 - Recyclable recording material containing microparticles

Title (en)

Recyclable recording material containing microparticles

Title (de)

Wiederverwendbares Aufzeichnungsmaterial, das Mikropartikel enthält

Title (fr)

Matériau d'enregistrement réutilisable contenant des microparticules

Publication

EP 0985543 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99117810 A

Priority

  • JP 25820298 A
  • JP 526599 A

Abstract (en)

A recyclable recording member. The member includes a substrate layer and a surface layer. The surface layer includes a water-swelling resin component and a micro-particle component. The micro-particle component content ratio is 1 to 50 parts-by-weight relative to 100 parts-by-weight of water-swelling resin. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 7/0009 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985543 A2 20000315; EP 0985543 A3 20020306; EP 0985543 B1 20080507; AT 394239 T 20080515; DE 69938637 D1 20080619

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160816

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-04-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090210

2008-06-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69938637 P 20080619

2008-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2008-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031010

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41M 7/00 A, 7G 03G 7/00 B, 7C 09D 5/00 B

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI