Global Patent Index - EP 0985549 B1

EP 0985549 B1 2001-02-07 - Sharpener

Title (en)

Sharpener

Title (de)

Spitzer

Title (fr)

Taille-crayon

Publication

EP 0985549 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118154 A

Priority

DE 19841730 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0985549A1] The pencil sharpener has a blade (13) fixed on a surface (11) of the housing which has a guide channel (6) with insert opening (7) for the pencil (2). The guide channel has starting from the insert opening a hollow cylindrical area (6a) adjoined by a hollow conical area (6b) forming a bending edge (19). The blade is held by a two point fixing at the outer end (14) and at the opposite inner end (18) and in the fixing position is under a bending strain in that the outer end is guided under a projection (16) fixed on the housing and the inner end is fixed by bending the blade round the bending edge. A cap (25) can be pushed onto the housing opposite the insert direction for the pencil.

Abstract (de)

Ein Spitzer (1) enthält ein Gehäuse (5) mit einer daran schraubfixierten Messerklinge (13), die einen an einen hohlzylindrischen Bereich (6a) unter Bildung einer Biegekante (19) angrenzenden hohlkegelförmigen Bereich (6b) eines Führungskanals (6) für den Stift (2) tangiert. In Fixierstellung steht die Messerklinge (13) unter einer Biegespannung, indem bei unter den gehäusefesten Vorsprung (16) geführtem Außenende (14) der Messerklinge (13) deren Innenende (15) unter Biegung der Messerklinge (13) um die Biegekante (19) am Gehäuse (5) fixiert ist. Es liegt somit eine besonders sichere und raumsparende beidendseitige Messerklingenfixierung (12) vor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43L 23/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43L 23/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43L 23/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985549 A1 20000315; EP 0985549 B1 20010207; DE 19841730 A1 20000323; US 6279237 B1 20010828

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900042

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

2015-09-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130911

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130911

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120920

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-06-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-09-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040913

2003-09-22 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-16 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2002-01-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: IPSER S.R.L.

2001-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010402

2001-03-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900042 20010315

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IE IT

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000403

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991223

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI