Global Patent Index - EP 0985550 A1

EP 0985550 A1 2000-03-15 - Planar decorative assembly

Title (en)

Planar decorative assembly

Title (de)

Ebene Zierkonstruktion

Title (fr)

Ensemble décoratif plan

Publication

EP 0985550 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98117252 A

Priority

  • EP 98117252 A
  • FR 9703058 A

Abstract (en)

The assembly consists of a series of polygonal components (6, 7) in at least two different shapes which can be assembled to give a three-dimensional interlaced effect. The components can be, for example, square and rectangular and set in rows and columns, or they can be hexagonal and parallelogram-shaped, with the parallelogram components fitted along the sides of the hexagons in lines which produce an interlaced effect. The components can be assembled, for example, inside a template of the required shape, and joined together by tongues in grooved edges.

Abstract (fr)

Cet ensemble décoratif comporte deux types d'éléments, à savoir: a) au moins un élément (6) de forme hexagonale, chaque côté de l'hexagone ayant une longueur déterminée C; b) une pluralité d'éléments (7) en forme de parallélogramme ayant chacun deux grands côtés opposés de longueur L et deux petits côtés opposés de longueur l, les angles opposés () entre un grand côté et un premier petit côté étant de 60°, et les angles opposés (<IMAGE>) entre ledit grand côté et un second petit côté étant de 120°. Il est caractérisé en ce que chaque élément (7) en forme de parallélogramme est disposé de façon que la moitié (81) d'un grand côté qui est contiguë à un angle de 60° soit disposée contre un côté d'un élément (6) de forme hexagonale. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44C 3/12; B44C 1/28; E04F 15/02; E01C 5/00; B27M 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 9/06 (2006.01); B44C 3/12 (2006.01); E04F 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 9/0669 (2013.01); B44C 3/123 (2013.01); E04F 15/02 (2013.01); A63F 2009/068 (2013.01); A63F 2009/0684 (2013.01); A63F 2009/0688 (2013.01); A63F 2009/0697 (2013.01); A63F 2009/0698 (2013.01); E01C 2201/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2760691 A1 19980918; FR 2760691 B1 19990423; EP 0985550 A1 20000315; EP 0985550 B1 20040121

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110912

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69821230

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100930

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100930

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080911

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FARGEOT XAVIER

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071016

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-07-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-05-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-05-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040502

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69821230 P 20040226

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT NL SE

2004-01-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-01-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040121

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 44C 3/12 A

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 44C 1/28 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04F 15/02 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 01C 5/00 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 27M 3/06 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 63F 9/06 B

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020809

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES GB IT NL SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT NL SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI