Global Patent Index - EP 0985603 A2

EP 0985603 A2 2000-03-15 - Holding system for bags

Title (en)

Holding system for bags

Title (de)

Traggestell für Säcke

Title (fr)

Système de support pour sacs

Publication

EP 0985603 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113840 A

Priority

DE 19831885 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19831885A1] The sack (27) is turned over a support ring (3) with a sloping inner surface (8) in a collar-like fashion. The end (33) is tucked under a tongue (12) so that the weight of the sack content produces a self-tightening action. The tongue has a thickened end (14) and can be made of elastic material. The shaped end (14) allows the sack to be easily released by pulling on the end (33).

Abstract (de)

Traggestell für Säcke mit einem eine trichterförmig schräg nach innen und unten gerichtete Innenfläche (8) aufweisenden Tragring (3) und wenigstens einer an einem Bereich dieser Innenfläche (8) angeordneten, schräg nach innen und nach unten gerichteten Klemmzunge (12) für einen über die obere Kante des Tragrings (3) kragenartig umzulegenden und unter wenigstens die eine Klemmzunge zu klemmenden Rand (33) des Sackes (27). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 67/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 67/12 (2006.01); B65F 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/1415 (2013.01); B65B 67/1233 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19831885 A1 20000120; EP 0985603 A2 20000315; EP 0985603 A3 20010131

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI