Global Patent Index - EP 0985606 A3

EP 0985606 A3 2000-12-27 - Fluid dispenser

Title (en)

Fluid dispenser

Title (de)

Spender für Medien

Title (fr)

Distributeur de produits fluides

Publication

EP 0985606 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99116461 A

Priority

DE 19840723 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0985606A2] A pump-operated eye droplet dispenser has an outlet (13) with a valve stopper (25). The dispenser is operated by spring (34) action. The medium passes to the outlet (13) via throttle points (22, 21, 49), to flow quasi-unpressurized onto a droplet formation surface (51).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/34; A61F 9/00; B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/05 (2006.01); B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B05B 11/04 (2006.01); B05C 5/00 (2006.01); B05C 17/005 (2006.01); B65D 47/28 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3053 (2013.01); B05B 11/0021 (2013.01); B05B 11/0059 (2013.01); B05B 11/0064 (2013.01); B05B 11/0072 (2013.01); B05B 11/3004 (2013.01); B05B 11/3026 (2013.01); B05B 11/307 (2013.01); B05B 11/3074 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19840723 A1 20000309; EP 0985606 A2 20000315; EP 0985606 A3 20001227; JP 2000128214 A 20000509; US 6308867 B1 20011030

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030527

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030116

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010530

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI