Global patent index - EP 0985609 A1

EP 0985609 A1 2000-03-15 - Vacuum pack filled with a granular material

Title (en)

Vacuum pack filled with a granular material

Title (de)

Vakuumverpackung gefüllt mit körnigem Material

Title (fr)

Emballage sous vide rempli de matériau granuleux

Publication

EP 0985609 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202967 A

Priority

NL 1010051 A

Abstract (en)

The vacuum pack is filled with a granular material such as ground coffee. The pack comprises a bottom, upright sidewalls and a top wall which are made of a sheetlike flexible material. The vacuum pack is at least substantially cube-shaped. In particular, the vacuum pack is folded up at its top by way of two parts of the sheetlike material lying against each other, which are fixedly bonded to each other, so that the pack can be opened by pulling the two parts loose from each other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/20; B65D 33/30; B65D 75/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/30 (2006.01); B65D 81/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/2023 (2013.01); B65D 33/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985609 A1 20000315; NL 1010051 C2 20000313

INPADOC legal status

2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030815

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030404

2000-12-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH LI

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH LI

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI