Global patent index - EP 0985616 A3

EP 0985616 A3 2001-01-17 - Web roll

Title (en)

Web roll

Title (de)

Bahnwickel

Title (fr)

Rouleau de bande

Publication

EP 0985616 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99500157 A

Priority

ES 9802298 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0985616A2] A roll of sheet-like material (1) comprising a web of sheet-like material (2) rolled up about itself in the lengthwise direction and which defines a crosswise leading edge (5), corresponding to the outside end of the roll (1) and a crosswise trailing edge (6), corresponding to the inside end of the roll (1), and at least one band (3) attached to said sheet-like material (2) in the direction of winding, which includes a number of main marks (7) having combined therewith indications (8) of the amount, expressed in units of length, of sheet-like material (2) remaining between the main mark (7) corresponding to each indication (8) and the trailing edge (6) of the sheet-like material (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/28 (2013.01); B65H 2511/11 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1241 (2013.01); B65H 2701/12422 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2511/11 + B65H 2220/03

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985616 A2 20000315; EP 0985616 A3 20010117; ES 1042074 U 19990816; ES 1042074 Y 20000101

INPADOC legal status

2002-06-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011108

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010427

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI