Global Patent Index - EP 0985619 A2

EP 0985619 A2 2000-03-15 - Device for transferring postal items to a storage device

Title (en)

Device for transferring postal items to a storage device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Übergabe von Postgut an eine Ablagevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour transférer du courrier à un dispositif de stockage

Publication

EP 0985619 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99250272 A

Priority

DE 19840917 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19840917C1] The arrangement has a transport roller (14) arranged in a franking and/or addressing machine (1) immediately after a conveyor belt (12), at the same height as the belt and rotating faster than the belt. A lower lying sliding region follows the transport roller in the transport direction. The orthogonal distance of the transport roller from a printer is greater than the longest print to be expected.

Abstract (de)

In der Frankier- und/oder Adressiermaschine (1) ist unmittelbar nach dem Transportband (12) und in einem ausreichenden Abstand zum Tintendruckkopf (10) eine angetriebene Transportrolle (14) vorgesehen, über die das Postgut (A) geführt wird und deren Umfangsgeschwindigkeit größer eingestellt ist als die des Transportbandes (12). Der orthogonale Abstand (a) zwischen Transportrolle (14) und Tintendruckkopf (10) ist so groß gewählt, daß der Brieflauf während des Drucks nur durch das Transportband (12) bestimmt wird. Auf diese Weise werden einerseits ein kontinuierlicher Briefdurchlauf bis zum Abschluß des Druckvorganges und andererseits ein beschleunigter Briefausstoß danach erreicht. Damit wird die Zeit bis zum Abkippen in den Ablagekasten (5) wesentlich verkürzt und ausreichend Zeit für die Einnahme der Ruhelage zur Verfügung gestellt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 13/10 (2006.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00467 (2013.01); B41J 13/106 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00233 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00596 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19840917 C1 20000113; EP 0985619 A2 20000315; EP 0985619 A3 20001227; EP 0985619 B1 20040218; US 6390702 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130813

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130813

2014-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908563

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130813

2014-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120606

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120906

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

- Free text: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG#TRIFTWEG 21-26#16547 BIRKENWERDER (DE) -TRANSFER TO- FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG#TRIFTWEG 21-26#16547 BIRKENWERDER (DE)

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908563 P 20040325

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 29/22 A, 7G 07B 17/00 B, 7B 41J 13/10 B

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI