Global patent index - EP 0985620 A2

EP 0985620 A2 2000-03-15 - Yarn feeding apparatus for textile machines

Title (en)

Yarn feeding apparatus for textile machines

Title (de)

Fadenliefergerät für Textilmaschinen

Title (fr)

Appareil d'alimentation de fil pour machines textiles

Publication

EP 0985620 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116263 A

Priority

DE 19840727 A

Abstract (en)

The yarn feed apparatus (1) at a textile machine, to give a positive yarn (2) feed, has a yarn feed wheel (17) on a carrier (4) which rotates round an axis (D) through a rotary drive (18). The wheel (17) has a yarn entry zone, yarn storage zone (26) and a yarn exit zone (36). The yarn exit zone (36) has a circular cross section. The cross section of the yarn storage zone (26) deviates from a concentric circle round the axis (D), at least in sections. The yarn entry zone has a solid surface, forming a concentric circle round the axis (D) at each point. The entry zone surface has a conical tapering towards the yarn storage zone (26) with the conical surface at an angle of 60 degrees to the axis (D) and preferably 75 degrees . The yarn exit zone (36) has a closed surface, forming a concentric circle to the axis (D) at each point, as an expanding cone away from the storage zone (26). Or the surface can be a curved surface on a torus with a curvature radius smaller than the radius of the feed wheel (17). The yarn storage zone (26), between the entry and exit (36) zones, has a solid surface with a polygon cross section concentric to the axis (D) at each point with straight edges or edges which are not straight. The cross section of the yarn storage zone (26) is defined radially outwards by preferably rounded laying sections, with the yarn storage zone (26) radially inwards between them as convex or concave curved or flat sections. The yarn delivery wheel (17) is in one piece with a shaft, wholly of ceramic, sapphire, quartz, a material with a diamond content, nitride or carbide. Or it has a basic body of metal and preferably aluminum. The metal body can be cladded with a coating containing oxygen and a component which differs from the material of the body. The yarn feed wheel (17) can have a wall at one end side with a center drilling for preferably a shaft to hold the wheel directly.

Abstract (de)

Ein Fadenliefergerät (1) weist ein Fadenlieferrad auf, das vorzugsweise aus Keramik besteht oder mit einem entsprechenden Stoff beschichtet ist. Das Fadenlieferrad weist dank seiner Materialwahl/oder seiner Formgebung verbesserte Dauerbetriebseigenschaften auf. Die Geometrie und/oder das Material ist wenig verschleißanfällig. Dies wird durch Keramikoberflächen und/oder die Kombination einer konischen durchgehenden Fadeneinlauffläche (24) mit sich anschliessenden streifenförmigen Auflageflächen (25) im Fadenspeicherbereich (26) und einer durchgehenden, d.h. ununterbrochenen Fläche im Fadenauslaufbereich erreicht, wobei die Flächen so geformt sind, dass der Faden auf seinem Weg von dem Einlaufbereich bis in den Auslaufbereich die entsprechenden Flächen (24,25,36) über den gesamten axialen Weg überstreicht. Die streifenförmige Abstützung oder Auflage des Fadens (2) im Fadenspeicherbereich wird durch entsprechende Formgebung des Fadenlieferrads (17) im Fadenspeicherbereich erreicht. Öffnungen oder Schlitze oder dgl. sind in dem Fadenlieferrad nicht erforderlich, können aber vorgesehen werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 51/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D04B 15/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985620 A2 20000315; EP 0985620 A3 20000412; EP 0985620 B1 20040303; AR 021791 A1 20020807; AU 6464299 A 20000327; BR 9913514 A 20010605; CA 2343271 A1 20000316; CN 1211268 C 20050720; CN 1314866 A 20010926; CZ 20010817 A3 20010912; DE 19840727 A1 20000525; EG 22127 A 20020830; ES 2216392 T3 20041016; HK 1040508 A1 20060224; ID 29548 A 20010906; JP 2002524367 A 20020806; JP 3459061 B2 20031020; KR 100434621 B1 20040605; PL 189296 B1 20050729; PL 347944 A1 20020422; PT 985620 E 20040630; RU 2200697 C2 20030320; SK 284478 B6 20050401; SK 2912001 A3 20011008; TR 200100669 T2 20010723; TW I234539 B 20050621; US 6568620 B1 20030527; WO 0014002 A1 20000316

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100218

2010-02-25 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100218

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070818

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070302

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080828

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080811

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070818

2007-04-25 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Ref Legal Event Code: LTLA

- Effective date: 20060818

2006-08-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060830

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050830

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-17 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27C

- Effective date: 20050328

2005-01-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: MAYER & CIE. GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20041202

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2216392

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-10-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-07-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040623

2004-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-05-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20040401242

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908700

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

2004-03-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: LT LV RO

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020719

2001-03-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB GR IT

2000-12-27 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20001010;LV PAYMENT 20001010;RO PAYMENT 20001010

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI