Global Patent Index - EP 0985621 A2

EP 0985621 A2 2000-03-15 - Yarn threading methods for a take-up winder

Title (en)

Yarn threading methods for a take-up winder

Title (de)

Procédé d'enfilage de fil textile pour un bobinoir

Title (fr)

Verfahren zum Einfädeln eines Garns für eine Aufwickelmaschine

Publication

EP 0985621 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99117570 A

Priority

JP 25769098 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a yarn threading method for a take-up winder which allows yarn to be threaded without fail by winding the yarn around a bobbin set on a bobbin holder. A bobbin holder 23 is moved to a position off a winding position A1 to thread a yarn to start winding it around a bobbin set on the bobbin holder 23. If a supporting member corresponding to the winding position A1 is available, it is preferable that the bobbin holder 23 be moved to a position where the path of yarn to be wound the bobbin does not intersect the supporting member 32 as viewed from the tip of the bobbin holder 23. If the yarn is adhesive, the bobbin holder is preferably moved before the yarn leaves a touch roller 27. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/048; B65H 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 65/00 (2006.01); B65H 67/048 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 57/003 (2013.01); B65H 65/00 (2013.01); B65H 67/048 (2013.01); B65H 2701/3132 (2013.01); B65H 2701/319 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985621 A2 20000315; EP 0985621 A3 20001122; EP 0985621 B1 20040526; DE 69917546 D1 20040701; DE 69917546 T2 20050818; JP 2000086090 A 20000328; JP 3440839 B2 20030825

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69917546

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN, DE

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69917546

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSA, DE

2009-06-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20090401

2005-09-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050906

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69917546 P 20040701

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020910

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE IT

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI