Global patent index - EP 0985629 A1

EP 0985629 A1 2000-03-15 - Crane

Title (en)

Crane

Title (de)

Kran

Title (fr)

Grue

Publication

EP 0985629 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98116951 A

Priority

EP 98116951 A

Abstract (en)

The crane has a hydraulically actuated jib system with at least one cylinder (3a,3b) for actuating it, and a device for monitoring the cylinder pressure indicating the crane load. The flow of hydraulic fluid to the cylinder is controlled by varying the cross-section of a valve (11). Depending on the time variation of the cylinder pressure or the load on the piston, a signal is generated that actuates the drive to alter the valve cross-section to reduce the measured pressure or load.

Abstract (de)

Kran (1) mit einem hydraulisch betätigten Auslegersystem (2-5), mit mindestens einem Zylinder (3) zur Betätigung des Auslegersystems (2,5) und einer Einrichtung zur Überwachung des die Belastung des Krans (1) anzeigenden Druckes im Zylinder (3), wobei der Zufluß von Hydraulikflüssigkeit zum Zylinder (3) durch Veränderung des Querschnitts eines Ventils (12) steuerbar ist, und daß in Abhängigkeit von der im Zylinder (3) festgestellten zeitlichen Änderung des Druckes bzw. der zeitlichen Änderung der Belastung des im Zylinder (3) geführten Kolbens ein Signal erzeugt wird, welches den Antrieb zur Verstellung des Ventilquerschnitts im Sinne einer Verringerung der festgestellten Druck- bzw. Belastungsänderung betätigt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 13/18; E02F 9/22; F15B 11/028

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 13/20 (2006.01); B66C 1/00 (2006.01); B66C 13/18 (2006.01); B66C 23/82 (2006.01); E02F 9/22 (2006.01); F15B 11/028 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/2207 (2013.01); B66C 13/066 (2013.01); B66C 13/18 (2013.01); F15B 11/028 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30515 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30525 (2013.01); F15B 2211/31576 (2013.01); F15B 2211/327 (2013.01); F15B 2211/35 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6313 (2013.01); F15B 2211/7053 (2013.01); F15B 2211/76 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985629 A1 20000315; EP 0985629 B1 20010725; AT 203488 T 20010815; DE 59801090 D1 20010830; DK 0985629 T3 20010924; ES 2158637 T3 20010901; JP 2000191285 A 20000711; KR 100392333 B1 20030722; KR 20000022752 A 20000425; US 6328173 B1 20011211

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160912

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150911

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150918

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150929

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150902

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-07-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-10-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20011009

2001-09-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2158637

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801090

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-08-30

2001-08-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2001-07-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 203488

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-01-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2001-01-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FR GB IT SE

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990706

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI