Global Patent Index - EP 0985630 A1

EP 0985630 A1 2000-03-15 - Method and device for determining the load profile during loading and unloading of containers

Title (en)

Method and device for determining the load profile during loading and unloading of containers

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung von Ladeprofilen biem Be- und Entladen von Containern

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour déterminer le profil de charge lors du chargement et déchargement de containers

Publication

EP 0985630 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116041 A

Priority

DE 19841570 A

Abstract (en)

The system is to determine the loading profile, when loading and unloading containers (6) between a quay (2) and a moored ship (1). The loading/unloading is with a quayside crane (3) with a jib (7) and trolley (4), and a container lifting harness (5). A monitor (9) at the trolley (4) registers the surface contours of the containers (6) at the quay, and the container load (8) at the ship in three co-ordinate directions. The readings are stored in a computer unit to give data to compute the load profile and give an automatic crane movement and especially the movements of the trolley and the crane hook lengths. The monitor system incorporates at least one distance meter, a laser scanner, a path movement monitor, a weight register and a computer.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Be- und Entladen von Containern zwischen einem Kai (2) und einem am Kai (2) liegenden Schiff (1) mittels eines Kaikrans (3) mit einem Kranausleger (7), einer Laufkatze (4) sowie einem Containerhebegeschirr (5), wird über eine an der Laufkatze (4) angeordnete Meßeinrichtung (9) die unter dieser befindliche Kai- und Schiffsoberflächenkontur sowie die Containerbeladung (8) des Schiffes (1) in drei Koordinatenrichtungen vermessen, diese Meßwerte werden in einer Rechnereinheit (12) gespeichert und es werden aus ihnen Ausgangsdaten in Form eines Profils errechnet, das für eine automatische Bewegungssteuerung der Kranlast, insbesondere für die Steuerung des Laufkatzenweges und der Kranhakenlänge, verwendet wird. Die hierfür vorgesehene Vorrichtung umfaßt wenigstens je einen Entfernungsmesser (10), einen Laserscanner (11), einen Weggeber (13), einen Lastgewichtgeber sowie eine Rechnereinheit (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 13/46; B66C 13/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 13/46 (2006.01); B66C 13/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 13/46 (2013.01); B66C 13/48 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985630 A1 20000315; DE 19841570 A1 20000323; DE 19841570 C2 20010412

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-25 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030211

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000403

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI