Global patent index - EP 0985633 A1

EP 0985633 A1 2000-03-15 - Method and device for automatic exchange of filling heads of a filling machine

Title (en)

Method and device for automatic exchange of filling heads of a filling machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum automatischen Wechseln von Füllköpfen einer Abfüllmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour échanger automatiquement les têtes de remplissage d'une machine de remplissage

Publication

EP 0985633 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112219 A

Priority

DE 19840172 A

Abstract (en)

The periphery of the container processing machine (1) has a number of processing heads (3) arranged on a rotor (2). In the area of the periuphery is an equipping and exchange automat (4) movable into different positions, with which eg. air tubes ar removed from the processing heads and placed in a storage position. Fresh air tubes with another length are then brought from their storage position and connected to the processing heads.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung zum Wechseln von an umlaufenden Behälterbehandlungsmaschinen angeordneten Bauteilen, insbesondere Behandlungskopfbauteilen zum Verändern des Füll-, Reinigungs- und/oder Verschließprogramms, wobei die einzelnen Bauteile entfernt und durch andere Bauteile ersetzt werden. Diese Vorrichtung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß an der Peripherie der Behälterbehandlungsmaschine ein in unterschiedliche Positionen verfahrbarer Bestückungs- und Wechselautomat vorgesehen ist, mit welchem Bauteile an den Behandlungsköpfen angebracht, vorhandene Bauteile von diesen entfernt und in eine Vorratsposition verbringbar und andere Bauteile aus ihrer Vorratsposition mit den Behandlungsköpfen verbindbar sind, wobei der Bestückungs- und Wechselautomat Teilsegmente der Behälterbehandlungsmaschine selbstätig abfährt und jeweils einen Bauteilwechsel an mindestens einem von nebeneinander angeordneten Behandlungsköpfen vollzieht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67C 3/26; B67C 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/22 (2006.01); B67C 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/26 (2013.01); B67C 3/22 (2013.01); B67C 3/222 (2013.01); B67C 2003/221 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0572107 A1 19931201 - SHIBUYA KOGYO CO LTD [JP]
  • [A] DE 19600274 A1 19970710 - HONSBERG LAMB SONDERWERKZEUGMA [DE]
  • [X] WYSSBROD, PETER: "Mehrspindelige Fertigung im Alltag", ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR WIRTSCHAFTLICHE FERTIGUNG UND AUTOMATISIERUNG, no. 6, 1988, pages 45 - 46, XP002125065

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19840172 A1 20000309; EP 0985633 A1 20000315

INPADOC legal status

2015-09-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20150516

2010-07-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-04-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KHS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021203

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI