Global Patent Index - EP 0985728 A1

EP 0985728 A1 2000-03-15 - Bleach activator granulate

Title (en)

Bleach activator granulate

Title (de)

Bleichaktivatorgranulate

Title (fr)

Activateur de blanchiment en forme granulaire

Publication

EP 0985728 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116968 A

Priority

DE 19841184 A

Abstract (en)

Bleach activator granulates are claimed, which are made by mixing bleach activator(s) with binder(s) and x wt.% of the total amount of water-soluble polymer(s) (I), spraying with water containing 100-x wt.% of the total amount of (I), where x is 0-100, then granulating and drying.

Abstract (de)

Es werden Bleichaktivatorgranulate beansprucht, die erhalten werden durch Mischen eines Bleichaktivators mit einem Bindemittel und x Gew.-% der Gesamtmenge eines wasserlöslichen Polymers, Aufsprühen von Wasser, das 100-x Gew.-% der Gesamtmenge des wasserlöslichen Polymers enthält, wobei x eine Zahl von 0 bis 100 ist, und anschließende Granulierung und Trocknung. Diese Granulate zeichnen sich aus durch eine verbesserte Abriebfestigkeit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/39; C11D 3/37; C11D 11/00; C11D 11/02; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 7/54 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3935 (2013.01); C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 3/3761 (2013.01); C11D 11/0088 (2013.01); C11D 3/391 (2013.01); C11D 3/3912 (2013.01); C11D 3/3915 (2013.01); C11D 3/3917 (2013.01); C11D 3/392 (2013.01); C11D 3/3925 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985728 A1 20000315; EP 0985728 B1 20090805; DE 19841184 A1 20000316; DE 59915059 D1 20090917; ES 2330169 T3 20091204; JP 2000087088 A 20000328; JP 4065632 B2 20080326; US 6214785 B1 20010410

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150821

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: WEYLCHEM WIESBADEN GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20150908

2015-08-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150730 AND 20150805

2015-04-14 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: WEYLCHEM WIESBADEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20150408

2014-10-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WEYLCHEM WIESBADEN GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59915059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-10-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59915059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ACKERMANN, JOACHIM KARL WILHELM, DIPL.-CHEM. D, DE

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-09-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59915059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ACKERMANN, JOACHIM KARL WILHELM, DIPL.-CHEM. D, DE

2013-09-13 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCOW

- Free Format Text: NEW ADDRESS: PATENT MANAGEMENT INDUSTRIEPARK HOECHST / G 860, 65926 FRANKFURT AM MAIN (DE)

2010-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20100507

2009-12-04 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2330169

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2009-09-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59915059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2009-09-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-08-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2009-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2009-08-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-05-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2006-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021113

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI