Global Patent Index - EP 0985739 A1

EP 0985739 A1 2000-03-15 - Method of hardening piston crowns and piston crown

Title (en)

Method of hardening piston crowns and piston crown

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Härten von Kolbenkronen und Kolbenkrone

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le durcissement de têtes de piston et tête de piston

Publication

EP 0985739 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98117125 A

Priority

EP 98117125 A

Abstract (en)

Process for hardening a partial region of the surface of steel semicrowns (2) is carried out by nitriding.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Härten zumindest eine Teilbereichs der Oberfläche von Kolbenkronen aus Stahl, und entsprechend hergestellte Kolbenkrone aus Stahl, insbesondere für Großdieselmotoren, wobei das Härten durch Nitrieren erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 8/26; F02F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/26 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/26 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01); F02F 2007/0097 (2013.01); F05C 2201/0433 (2013.01); F05C 2201/0448 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985739 A1 20000315; EP 0985739 B1 20030514; DE 59808370 D1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160909

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151001

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59808370

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI NL

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010628

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI NL

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HORST, REINKE

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000107

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI NL

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI