Global Patent Index - EP 0985755 A1

EP 0985755 A1 2000-03-15 - Automated spinning apparatus and process

Title (en)

Automated spinning apparatus and process

Title (de)

Automatisierte Spinnvorrichtung und Verfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de filature automatisée

Publication

EP 0985755 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99203798 A

Priority

  • EP 94930503 A
  • US 13446193 A
  • US 21737594 A

Abstract (en)

A plant structure having three floors (3, 5, 7) with first and second ringless spinning apparatuses (11, 13) located on the first floor and with vertical sliver feed tubes (31, 33) extending from the first and second ringless spinning apparatuses respectively to the second floor for feeding a sliver (45, 47) through the sliver feed tube to the first ringless spinning apparatus and to the third floor for feeding sliver from a can thereof to said second ringless spinning apparatus. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 13/04; D01H 13/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 3448571 A 19690610 - TSUZUKI RYOHEI
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 421 (C - 878) 25 October 1991 (1991-10-25)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985755 A1 20000315

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030208

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020731

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KITI INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-03-15 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 673449

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE