Global Patent Index - EP 0985763 A3

EP 0985763 A3 2001-04-11 - Machine for making a web material

Title (en)

Machine for making a web material

Title (de)

Maschine zur Herstellung einer Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Machine pour la fabrication d'une bande de matériau

Publication

EP 0985763 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99114584 A

Priority

DE 19840021 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0985763A2] The papermaking machine (10) has cutters (32,34) at the fourdrinier (22) to trim the web (12) width according to required format. The width of the suction zone at the pick-up suction roller (14) is set by bars (36,38), to the required web format width. The cutters (32,34) and bars (36,38) have a synchronized and simultaneous setting movement through a motor-powered adjustment system (40,42,44). The web width cutters are spray jets (32,34) to trim the edges of the web (12). The adjustment system has a control unit (40), with the data for the web (12) format and the nominal positions for the edge cutters (32,34) and suction roller bars (36,38). A number of web formats are held in memory and/or are programmed at the control (40). At least one path measurement unit (46) is connected to the control (40). The setting controls (42,44) are operated by spindle drives, with at least one setting motor on the spindle. The setting drives can also be operated by piston/cylinder units, where the setting drives (42,44) and the path monitor (46) are connected to the control (40). To produce a leader strip, an additional spray jet cutter has a lateral movement across the web (12), with a setting drive operated by the control (40). To transfer the leader strip into the press section (II), the format cutters (32,34) and format suction bars (36,38) are initially moved into the maximum width (Bmax) setting and, after the transfer of the leader strip, they are returned to the nominal positions for the required web format width. At least part of the setting drive system (42,44) is remote controlled.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 2/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/56 (2006.01); D21F 2/00 (2006.01); D21F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 2/00 (2013.01); D21F 1/56 (2013.01); D21F 3/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19840021 A1 20000309; EP 0985763 A2 20000315; EP 0985763 A3 20010411; EP 0985763 B1 20040707; US 6277244 B1 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909892

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120726

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100727

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110714

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-06-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050408

2004-08-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909892 P 20040812

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI