Global Patent Index - EP 0985766 A1

EP 0985766 A1 2000-03-15 - Track-working machine

Title (en)

Track-working machine

Title (de)

Maschine zur Gleisbearbeitung

Title (fr)

Machine pour le traitement des voies ferrées

Publication

EP 0985766 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99890255 A

Priority

AT 152598 A

Abstract (en)

The track maintenance machine, for a railway permanent way (15) of rails (14) and sleepers (12), has a machine frame (3) and two spaced rail lifters (13) along the longitudinal line of the machine, with height adjustment and operated by drives (19). Each has a unit (8) to slide the sleepers, moved by a drive across the line of the track, and a press unit (10) to act on the sliding sleeper (12). A unit (23) to remove the intermediate layers, between the rails and sleepers, is between the rail lifters (13), with height adjustment.

Abstract (de)

Eine Maschine (1) zur Bearbeitung von Zwischenlagen eines aus Schienen (14) und Schwellen (12) gebildeten Gleises (15) besteht aus einem Maschinenrahmen (3) und zwei in Maschinenlängsrichtung voneinander distanzierten, durch Antriebe (19) höhenverstellbaren Gleishebeeinrichtungen (13). Diesen ist jeweils eine Schwellenverschiebeeinrichtung (8) mit einem durch einen Antrieb in Gleisquerrichtung verstellbaren, zur Anlage an die zu verschiebende Schwelle (12) vorgesehenen Anpreßorgan (10) zugeordnet. Zwischen den beiden Gleishebeeinrichtungen (13) ist eine höhenverstellbare Abtrageinrichtung (23) zur Entfernung der auf der verschobenen Schwelle (12) befindlichen Zwischenlagen vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 29/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 29/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 29/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985766 A1 20000315; EP 0985766 B1 20030924; CA 2281994 A1 20000309; CA 2281994 C 20051115; DE 59907098 D1 20031030; US 6145557 A 20001114

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130803

2014-06-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907098

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130803

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130803

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130803

2014-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 250692 T

- Effective date: 20130803

2014-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120711

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120824

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120808

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120629

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031209

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907098 P 20031030

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI