Global Patent Index - EP 0985772 A3

EP 0985772 A3 2001-02-28 - Assembly device for sanitary devices

Title (en)

Assembly device for sanitary devices

Title (de)

Montageeinheit für Sanitäreinrichtungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'assemblage pour appareils sanitaires

Publication

EP 0985772 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99117133 A

Priority

  • DE 19840996 A
  • DE 19907963 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0985772A2] The installation kit for bathroom and sanitary fittings has a central carrier pillar (1) with at least two connecting zones at an angle to each other or in parallel, and especially at diametrically opposite points, with mounting surfaces (3,5,7) for the fittings. The pillar (1) has an inner zone (10) at one mounting surface (3) to accommodate the cistern (2) for a toilet bowl, or to take the water inflow and outflow pipes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/01; E03D 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/01 (2006.01); E03D 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/01 (2013.01); E03D 11/146 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985772 A2 20000315; EP 0985772 A3 20010228; US 6460204 B1 20021008

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050614

2005-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050202

2002-01-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010828

2001-12-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI