Global patent index - EP 0985776 A2

EP 0985776 A2 2000-03-15 - Wall system

Title (en)

Wall system

Title (de)

Wandsystem

Title (fr)

Système de paroi

Publication

EP 0985776 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99117619 A

Priority

DE 19841055 A

Abstract (en)

Wall (1) consists of a number of bricks (2) arranged in the wall so that the axis (4) of the hollow spaces (3) is essentially vertical and the individual layers of the bricks are bound by a mortar layer (5). The mortar layer is a thin bed mortar layer applied on one part of the horizontal layer of the multi-chamber bricks (2). Wall (1) consists of a number of bricks (2) arranged in the wall so that the axis (4) of the hollow spaces (3) is essentially vertical and the individual layers of the bricks are bound by a mortar layer (5). The mortar layer is a thin bed mortar layer applied on one part of the horizontal layer of the multi-chamber bricks (2). The openings (6) of the hollow spaces (3) are closed on the surfaces (O) of the bricks.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Mauer (1), bestehend aus einer Vielzahl von im wesentlichen quaderförmigen Mehrkammersteinen (2), sich entlang einer Koordinatenrichtung des Steins (2) erstreckende Hohlräume (3), wobei eine Vielzahl der Steine (2) in der Mauer (1) so angeordnet sind, daß die Achse (4) der Hohlräume (3) im wesentlichen vertikal angeordnet ist, und wobei die einzelnen horizontalen Lagen der Steine (2) mit einer Mörtelschicht (5) verbunden sind. Erfindungsgemäß ist vorgesehen, daß die Mörtelschicht (5) eine Dünnbettmörtelschicht ist und derart auf Steine (2) aufgebracht ist, daß die Öffnungen (6) der Hohlräume (3) an der Oberfläche (O) der Mehrkammersteine (2) im wesentlichen vollflächig verschlossen sind. So entsteht ein ordnungsgemäßes, exakt ausgerichtetes, festes und tragfähiges Mauerwerk, in dem die überbrückenden Dünnbettfugen bauphysikalische Vorteile bezüglich Schall- und Wärmedämmung schaffen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4405796 A1 19950824 - TUBAG TRASS ZEMENT STEIN [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985776 A2 20000315; EP 0985776 A3 20010912; DE 19841055 A1 20000323

INPADOC legal status

2007-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070403

2005-10-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: QUICK-MIX GRUPPE GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-10-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HUENING ELEMENTBAU GMBH & CO KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011022

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 04B 2/14 A, 7E 04B 2/02 B

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI