Global Patent Index - EP 0985777 A2

EP 0985777 A2 2000-03-15 - Brick and method of manufacturing

Title (en)

Brick and method of manufacturing

Title (de)

Mauerstein und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Brique et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0985777 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99117620 A

Priority

DE 19841053 A

Abstract (en)

To produce a building brick (1), especially of clay or loam, the material is prepared and mixed with additives such as sawdust. The material is extruded into the profile of the brick (1). The extruded brick material is cut into lengths while maintaining a given tolerance (T) so that no further finishing work is required to achieve a brick (1) of the required and defined height (H), and especially no additional grinding is needed.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Mauersteins (1), insbesondere aus Ton oder Lehm, mit den Verfahrensschritten: a) Herstellung eines Materialgemisches (2), insbesondere aus Ton und/oder Lehm unter Zugabe von Zusatzstoffen wie beispielsweise Sägemehl, b) Pressen des Materialgemisches durch eine Strangpresse, deren Spritzkopf (3) dem Profil des Mauersteins (1) entspricht, c) Ablängen einzelner Mauersteine (1) als Teil des durch den Spritzkopf (3) Strangpresse gepreßten Materials (2), wodurch ein Mauersteinrohling mit gewünschter Steinhöhe (H) hergestellt wird, und d) Trocknen des Mauersteinrohlings. Erfindungsgemäß ist vorgesehen, daß die Ablängung der einzelnen Mauersteine (1) gemäß Schritt c) unter Einhaltung einer geringen Toleranz (T) in der Weise erfolgt, daß eine Nachbearbeitung des Mauersteins (1) zur Erzielung einer definierten Steinhöhe (H), insbesondere durch Schleifen, nicht erforderlich ist. Damit werden Planziegel hergestellt, die keine Nachbearbeitung durch Schleifen benötigen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 11/16 (2006.01); E04B 2/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/14 (2013.01); B28B 11/163 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985777 A2 20000315; EP 0985777 A3 20010912; DE 19841053 A1 20000316; DE 19841053 B4 20111013

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020401

2002-07-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 2/14 A, 7B 28B 11/16 B

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI