Global Patent Index - EP 0985779 A2

EP 0985779 A2 2000-03-15 - Loadbearing wall element for wooden framework constructions

Title (en)

Loadbearing wall element for wooden framework constructions

Title (de)

Tragendes Wandscheibenelement für eine Konstruktion in Holzrippenbauweise

Title (fr)

Pannneau de mur porteur pour une construction en bois

Publication

EP 0985779 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99117070 A

Priority

DE 19841111 A

Abstract (en)

The load-bearing wall panel, for a wood rib construction, has a threshold (1) and frame (2) section, with a panel (3) of the required length between them. The threshold (1) has a groove (4) at its upper surface to take the foot of the panel (3), and a similar groove (4) at the frame section (2) holds the top of the panel (3). The panel (3) is secured in the grooves (4) by glue. Vertical ribs (8) stiffen the panel (3), between the threshold (1) and frame (2) sections, and pref. offset, to support the outer and/or inner wall claddings.

Abstract (de)

Tragendes Wandscheibenelement für eine Konstruktion in Holzrippenbauweise, aufweisend einen der Länge des Wandscheibenelements entsprechenden Schwellen- (1) und Rähmabschnitt (2) mit einer sich zwischen diesen Abschnitten (1 und 2) erstreckenden aussteifenden Scheibe (3) entsprechender Länge, die in einer auf der Oberseite des Schwellenabschnitts vorgesehenen ersten Nut (4) und in einer auf der Unterseite des Rähmabschnitts vorgesehenen zweiten Nut (4) eingeleimt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 2/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/386 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985779 A2 20000315; EP 0985779 A3 20010829; DE 19841111 A1 20000316

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-06-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI