Global patent index - EP 0985780 A1

EP 0985780 A1 2000-03-15 - Roof or facade cladding

Title (en)

Roof or facade cladding

Title (de)

Abdeckung für Dächer oder Fassaden

Title (fr)

Revêtement pour toits ou façades

Publication

EP 0985780 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116774 A

Priority

DE 19840795 A

Abstract (en)

The roofing or facade frontage is designed as profiled thinwalled strips (2) joined horizontally to the substructure (4) of the roof etc plus shingle plates joined positively to two adjoining strips. The shingle plates in any one row (R,R1) are hooked together by overlapping side strips and the top edges of the shingles in any one row are hung in a stop groove (19) defined by the substructure (4) and profile strip (2). The bottom edges (23) grasp the shingles (3) of the next row down as well as the descending edge (15) of the strip (2) by means of flexible tongues (28). The shingle width exceeds its vertical extent down the roof slope or the facade, and each profile strip (2) has a zee-section arrester leg fixed on the substructure and a supporting piece at right angles to the leg plus a fixer leg to couple to the shingle top edges (20) as well as support and locate the edges (23) of the shingles (3) in the next row up.

Abstract (de)

Die Abdeckung (1) setzt sich aus an einer Unterkonstruktion (4) eines Dachs oder einer Fassade in weitgehend horizontaler paralleler Ausrichtung festlegbaren dünnwandigen Profilleisten (2) und mit jeweils zwei einander benachbarten Profilleisten (2) kraftschlüssig koppelbaren plattenartigen Formschindeln (3) zusamnen. Die jeweils in einer Reihe (R, R1 usw.) nebeneinander liegenden Formschindeln (3) sind über seitliche Randstreifen überlappend miteinander verhakt. Die oberen Längsränder (20) der Formschindeln (3) einer Reihe (R1) sind in eine durch die Unterkonstruktion (4) sowie eine Profilleiste (2) begrenzte Rastfuge (29) eingehängt, während die unteren Längsränder (23) die benachbarte Profilleiste (2) sowie die oberen Längsränder (20) der Formschindeln (3) der nächst unteren Reihe (R) übergreifen und den abwärts gerichteten Rand (15) dieser Profilleiste (2) mit biegsamen Zungen (28) umgreifen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 12/00; E04D 1/06; E04D 1/18; E04F 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/06 (2006.01); E04D 1/18 (2006.01); E04D 12/00 (2006.01); E04F 13/08 (2006.01); E04F 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/18 (2013.01); E04D 1/06 (2013.01); E04D 12/004 (2013.01); E04F 13/0864 (2013.01); E04F 13/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19840795 A1 20000309; EP 0985780 A1 20000315

INPADOC legal status

2004-08-18 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040624

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030422

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI