Global Patent Index - EP 0985781 A3

EP 0985781 A3 2000-11-22 - Method for the manufacture of wood flooring and wood flooring obtained thereby

Title (en)

Method for the manufacture of wood flooring and wood flooring obtained thereby

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Holzfussbodens, sowie hiermit hergestellter Holzfussboden

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de plancher en bois et plancher en bois ainsi fabriqués

Publication

EP 0985781 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99116408 A

Priority

DE 19841433 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0985781A2] To produce a wood floor, the wood covering layer (4) is fitted to a carrier layer (6) after the wood planks (4a,4b) have been immersed in a bath of protective oil or wax. The immersion is pref. under pressure and, after immersion, surplus protective material is extracted by suction from the surface and/or the inner cells of the wood. The wood is heated to harden the protective material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 15/04; B27K 3/00; B27M 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27K 3/08 (2006.01); B27K 3/48 (2006.01); B27M 3/04 (2006.01); E04F 15/022 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/022 (2013.01); B27M 3/04 (2013.01); E04F 15/045 (2013.01); B27K 3/0292 (2013.01); B27K 3/08 (2013.01); B27K 3/36 (2013.01); B27K 5/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985781 A2 20000315; EP 0985781 A3 20001122; DE 19841433 A1 20000323; DE 19841433 C2 20010823

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-09-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI