Global patent index - EP 0985783 A3

EP 0985783 A3 2001-01-17 - Volume system

Title (en)

Volume system

Title (de)

Raumsystem

Title (fr)

Système de volume

Publication

EP 0985783 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99113254 A

Priority

DE 19840973 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0985783A2] The corner units (2) restrictedly encroach on the adjacent room and stand at variable spacing, each unit (2) coupled in steps or steplessly to the adjoining length-adjustable cross connector (3). The side parts (21) of the unit (2) are joined at the corner by brackets placed at the side part (21) foot and/or top edge and lodged in side part grooves. The side parts (21) present holohedral or frame type components and wall parts and sliding doors or windows can be suspended from the cross connectors (3). Additional connectors (4) coupled to the main connectors (3) can be fitted out with ceiling covering, electrical appliances such as lamps etc. Each corner unit (2) has at least three feet and one of the units (2) should be designed as a multiple corner element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/58 (2006.01); E04H 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/585 (2013.01); E04H 1/1272 (2013.01); E04B 2001/5875 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19840973 A1 20000309; EP 0985783 A2 20000315; EP 0985783 A3 20010117

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030614

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020226

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010627

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI