Global patent index - EP 0985784 A3

EP 0985784 A3 2001-01-10 - Device for facilitating the parking of a motor vehicle in a relatively narrow garage

Title (en)

Device for facilitating the parking of a motor vehicle in a relatively narrow garage

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Erleichtern des Parkens eines Kraftfahrzeugs in einer engen Garage

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour faciliter le garage d'un véhicule automobile dans un garage relativement étroit

Publication

EP 0985784 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99202768 A

Priority

IT RE980043 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0985784A2] Device for facilitating the parking of a motor vehicle in a relatively narrow garage comprises a self-propelled horizontal platform (1) to be positioned on the floor (100) of the garage (9) to support the front wheels (66) of a motor vehicle (6), and provided with a remotely controllable operating system (3, 4) which causes the platform (1) to slide parallel to itself along the longitudinal axis of the garage (9) between a first position situated at the entrance to said garage (9) and a second position situated in proximity to the rear wall of the garage (9). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 6/06; E04H 6/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 6/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 6/424 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985784 A2 20000315; EP 0985784 A3 20010110; IT 245252 Y1 20020320; IT RE980043 U1 20000310

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-10-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 04H 6/06 A, 7E 04H 6/42 B

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI