Global patent index - EP 0985793 A2

EP 0985793 A2 2000-03-15 - Sliding door

Title (en)

Sliding door

Title (de)

Schiebetür

Title (fr)

Porte coulissante

Publication

EP 0985793 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99307143 A

Priority

  • KR 19980037129 A
  • KR 19990006702 A

Abstract (en)

A sliding door is disclosed. The sliding door has one or more door panels (2, 3, 4), and a sliding means being mounted to the door panels and allowing the door panels to slide. In the sliding means, a bracket (15') has a longitudinal stopper guide slot (19) and a guide groove (10). One or more sliding bars (15) individually have a longitudinal stopper guide slot (19) and a guide groove (16). One or more sliders (10) are inserted into the guide grooves, thus sliding within the guide grooves. Each slider has stoppers (12) disposed within the stopper guide slots. With such a sliding door configuration, an entrance through the opened sliding door is widened relative to known sliding doors, mass production of the door parts and installation of a sliding door becomes relatively easy, and walking and carrying baggage beyond the door are not impeded by door frames. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/06; A47K 3/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/00 (2006.01); A47K 3/34 (2006.01); E05D 15/06 (2006.01); E05D 15/08 (2006.01); E05F 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/08 (2013.01); A47K 3/34 (2013.01); E05D 15/0647 (2013.01); E05D 15/0682 (2013.01); E05F 17/004 (2013.01); E05F 2017/005 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/684 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/122 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/114 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985793 A2 20000315; EP 0985793 A3 20010704; CN 1250132 A 20000412; KR 100363036 B1 20021211; KR 20000012166 A 20000306; SG 81304 A1 20010619; TW 421692 B 20010211

INPADOC legal status

2002-12-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020105

2002-05-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-03-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 05D 15/06 A, 7A 47K 3/30 B, 7A 47K 3/34 B

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI