Global Patent Index - EP 0985814 A2

EP 0985814 A2 2000-03-15 - Method and apparatus for controlling at least one electromagnetic valve

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for controlling at least one electromagnetic valve

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung wenigstens eines Magnetventils

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour commander au moins une soupape éléctromagnétique

Publication

EP 0985814 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99107944 A

Priority

DE 19833830 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19833830A1] At the start of energizing the magnetic valve it is put under booster voltage, increased with respect to the rest of the energizing process. At least one magnitude, affecting the energy and/or the power applied to the magnetic valve at the start of energizing, can be preset in dependence of at least one operational magnitude of the IC engine. An Independent claim is included for the energizing mechanism.

Abstract (de)

Es werden ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Ansteuerung wenigstens eines Magnetventils, das zur Steuerung der Einspritzung von Kraftstoff in eine Brennkraftmaschine dient, beschrieben. Zu Beginn der Ansteuerung wird das Magnetventil mit einer gegenüber der weiteren Ansteuerung erhöhten Boosterspannung beaufschlagt. Die Energie oder die Leistung, mit der das Magnetventil zu Beginn der Ansteuerung beaufschlagt wird, ist abhängig vom Betriebszustand der Brennkraftmaschine beeinflußbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/20 (2006.01); H01F 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/1816 (2013.01); F02D 41/20 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2006 (2013.01); F02D 2041/201 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2027 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2044 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2058 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2075 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19833830 A1 20000203; EP 0985814 A2 20000315; EP 0985814 A3 20010314; EP 0985814 B1 20041020; JP 2000054932 A 20000222; US 6250286 B1 20010626

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090422

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090422

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090422

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080423

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080426

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-09-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910889 P 20041125

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030807

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010914

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI