Global Patent Index - EP 0985822 A1

EP 0985822 A1 2000-03-15 - Method for starting an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Method for starting an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Starten eines Verbrennungsmotors

Title (fr)

Méthode pour démarrer un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0985822 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115463 A

Priority

DE 19841752 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves using a starter whose starting revolution rate can be controlled or regulated. The starting revolution rate is regulated to a defined maximum value selected according to motor vehicle and/or combustion engine operating parameters. The starter is driven with optimal torque provided by a battery until the maximum starting revolution rate is achieved.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Starten eines Verbrennungsmotors eines Fahrzeugs mit einer Starteinrichtung zum Starten des Verbrennungsmotors, bei der die Startdrehzahl steuer- oder regelbar ist. Zur Minimierung der Startenergie, Verkürzung der Startzeit, Erhöhung der Startsicherheit und Verringerung der Emissionen im Start wird vorgeschlagen, die von der Starteinrichtung erzeugte Drehzahl auf eine bestimmte Starthöchstdrehzahl einzuregeln. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/08 (2013.01); F02N 2200/022 (2013.01); F02N 2200/023 (2013.01); F02N 2200/061 (2013.01); F02N 2300/102 (2013.01); F02N 2300/104 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985822 A1 20000315; EP 0985822 B1 20020123; DE 19841752 A1 20000316; ES 2170561 T3 20020801; JP 2000087830 A 20000328; US 6286470 B1 20010911

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160812

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-08-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050805

2005-03-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030806

2004-08-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-08-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-08-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030806

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-08-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-01-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020830

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-08-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020808

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170561 T3

2002-07-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020407

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900761 20020314

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001016

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI