Global Patent Index - EP 0985829 A2

EP 0985829 A2 2000-03-15 - Housing for radial blower

Title (en)

Housing for radial blower

Title (de)

Gebläsegehäuse und Radialgebläse

Title (fr)

Boîtier pour soufflante radial

Publication

EP 0985829 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99117719 A

Priority

DE 19841762 A

Abstract (en)

The fan housing has a housing assembly with at least one bearer part (5) mounted near an axial air inlet opening (1) of a fan and that forms a bearing for a bearer element of the fan assembly. The housing assembly has at least two shell parts (7a,7b) that are reversibly connected together and that divide the air inlet opening, whereby the bearer part is held between the shell parts in the assembled state. An Independent claim is also included for a fan.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Gehäuse für ein Gebläse, wobei das Gebläse mindestens eine axiale Lufteintrittsöffnung (1) und eine radiale Luftausblasöffnung (2) aufweist und aus einer Gehäusebaugruppe und aus einer Lüfterbaugruppe mit einem Elektromotor (3) und einem Lüfterrad (4) besteht, wobei die Gehäusebaugruppe mindestens ein Trägerteil (5) umfaßt, das im Bereich der axialen Lufteintrittsöffnung (1) angeordnet ist und zur lagernden Aufnahme eines Tragelementes der Lüfterbaugruppe dient. Um den Herstellungs- und Montageaufwand zu senken, weist die Gehäusebaugruppe mindestens zwei lösbar miteinander verbindbare, die Lufteintrittsöffnung (1) teilende Schalenteile (7a, 7b) auf, wobei das Trägerteil (5) im Montagezustand zwischen den Schalenteilen (7a, 7b) gehalten ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/62; F04D 29/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/42 (2006.01); F04D 29/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/626 (2013.01); F04D 29/4226 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985829 A2 20000315; EP 0985829 A3 20011114; EP 0985829 B1 20040506; AT 266152 T 20040515; DE 19841762 A1 20000323; DE 19841762 C2 20020718; ES 2219966 T3 20041201

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041006

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EBM-PAPST MULFINGEN G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2007-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BRAUNPAT BRAUN EDER AG

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050208

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EBM-PAPST MULFINGEN G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-12-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2219966

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040825

2004-09-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-08-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-08-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-08-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909383

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-05-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BRAUN & PARTNER PATENT-, MARKEN-, RECHTSANWAELTE

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-05-06 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-05-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EBM-PAPST MULFINGEN GMBH & CO.KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020208

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EBM WERKE GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 04D 29/62 A, 7F 04D 29/42 B, 7F 04D 25/06 B

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STRENG, GUNTER, DIPL.-ING.

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MUELLER, RAINER, DIPL.-ING.

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BAMBERGER, BERNDHARD

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI