Global Patent Index - EP 0985869 A2

EP 0985869 A2 2000-03-15 - Louvre for a luminaire and method of making the painted edges of louvre parts

Title (en)

Louvre for a luminaire and method of making the painted edges of louvre parts

Title (de)

Leuchtenraster sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung lackierter Kanten von Teilen von Leuchtenrastern

Title (fr)

Grille pour luminaire et procédé de fabrication des bords laqués de pièces d'une grille pour luminaire

Publication

EP 0985869 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99105242 A

Priority

DE 19840718 A

Abstract (en)

The light raster contains parts such as transverse lamella (2) and/or lateral parts and/or longitudinal lamella with edges (4) at least on their ends facing in the light output direction. The edges are colored in an area around the edges, especially of monochrome color. Protective foil (1) is removed from the strip of material that will form the edge (3) to enable painting. An Independent claim is also included for a method of producing painted edges on parts of light rasters.

Abstract (de)

Leuchtenraster sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung lackierter Kanten von Teilen von Leuchtenrastern, wobei die die Kanten (4) aufweisenden Teile Querlamellen (2) und/oder Seitenteile und/oder Längslamellen sein können und wobei die Querlamellen (2), Seitenteile und Längslamellen sowie die an ihnen zu verfärbenden Kanten (4) aus einem Endlos-Material durch Stanzen und Biegen gefertigt werden, das zumindest einseitig mit einer Schutzfolie (1) versehen ist, und wobei vor oder nach dem Biegen der zu lackierenden Kanten (4) die Schutzfolie (1) in einem Bereich (Streifen 3) um die Kanten (4) entfernt wird; nach dem Entfernen der Schutzfolie (1) in dem Bereich (Streifen 3) um die Kanten (4) und dem Biegen der Kanten (4) werden die Kanten (4) und der diese umgebende, von der Schutzfolie (1) befreite Bereich (Streifen 3) lackiert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 11/06; F21V 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 11/02 (2006.01); F21V 11/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 11/06 (2013.01); F21V 11/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985869 A2 20000315; EP 0985869 A3 20020306; DE 19840718 A1 20000330; HU 9902988 A2 20000528; HU 9902988 D0 19991129; NO 991365 A 20000308; NO 991365 D0 19990322; PL 334587 A1 20000313

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020907

2003-01-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI