Global Patent Index - EP 0985876 A1

EP 0985876 A1 2000-03-15 - Burner

Title (en)

Burner

Title (de)

Brenner

Title (fr)

Brûleur

Publication

EP 0985876 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810902 A

Priority

EP 98810902 A

Abstract (en)

A burner for generating hot gasses, e.g. for a gas turbine, has a compact construction with two part shells (1,2) which form the diverging burner chamber. The part shells overlap by their edges to form tangential air inlet ducts (5,6). The fuel inlets (15) are near the tangential inlets and the cross-sectional shape of the burner is non-circular and damps out any periodic vibrations in the burner chamber.

Abstract (de)

Ein Brenner zum Betrieb eines Aggregats zur Erzeugung eines Heißgases besteht im wesentlichen aus mindestens zwei hohlen, in Strömungsrichtung ineinandergeschachtelten Teilkörpern (1, 2), deren Mittelachsen zueinander versetzt verlauten, dergestalt, daß benachbarte Wandungen der Teilkörper (1, 2) tangentiale Lufteintrittskanäle (5, 6) für die Einströmung von Verbrennungsluft (7) in einen von den Teilkörpern (1, 2) vorgegebenen Innenraum (8) bilden. Der Brenner weist zumindest eine Brennstoffdüse (11) auf. Jeder der ineinandergeschachtelten Teilkörper (1, 2) weitet sich kegelartig entlang der Brennerachse zum Brenneraustritt (17) hin auf und weist senkrecht zur Brennerachse einen nichtkreisförmigen Querschnitt auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 7/00; F23D 11/40; F23D 14/02; F23D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/00 (2006.01); F23D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/002 (2013.01); F23D 17/002 (2013.01); F23C 2900/07002 (2013.01); F23D 2206/10 (2013.01); F23D 2210/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985876 A1 20000315

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Inventor name: PASCHEREIT, CHRISTIAN OLIVER, DR.

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Inventor name: WEISENSTEIN, WOLFGANG

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GUTMARK, EPHRAIM, PROF.

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PASCHEREIT, CHRISTIAN OLIVER, DR.

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WEISENSTEIN, WOLFGANG

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI