Global Patent Index - EP 0985880 A1

EP 0985880 A1 2000-03-15 - Chimney pipe

Title (en)

Chimney pipe

Title (de)

Kaminrohr

Title (fr)

Conduit de cheminée

Publication

EP 0985880 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117681 A

Priority

DE 29815970 U

Abstract (en)

A profiling (14) formed on the inner surface of the chimney tube offers an enlarged surface in relation to a smooth inner surface and in cross-section, in relation to a peripheral direction of the chimney tube, is at least sectionally formed continuously. The profiling is wave-shaped and so formed that a profile form can be determined cross-sectionally by a number of adjacent sections defined by circular arcs of a same radius of a smooth inner surface of a predetermined wall thickness.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Kaminrohr, insbesondere zur Verwendung in einem Nasskamin, aus einem einen starren Rohrkörper (10) ausbildenden Kunststoffmaterial, insbesondere PVDF oder PETP, mit einer glatten, zylindrischen Außenfläche (12), wobei eine auf eine Innenfläche des Kaminrohres gebildete Profilierung (14) vorgesehen ist, die eine gegenüber einer glatten Innenfläche vergrößerte Oberfläche anbietet und im Querschnitt, bezogen auf eine Umfangsrichtung des Kaminrohres, zumindest abschnittsweise kontinuierlich ausgebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23J 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 17/02 (2006.01); F23J 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 17/02 (2013.01); F23J 13/02 (2013.01); F23J 2213/302 (2013.01); F23J 2900/13022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29815970 U1 19990318; EP 0985880 A1 20000315

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021113

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI