Global Patent Index - EP 0985887 A1

EP 0985887 A1 2000-03-15 - Protective device for stove tops

Title (en)

Protective device for stove tops

Title (de)

Sicherheitseinrichtungen an Kochstellenoberteilen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection pour dessus de cuisinières

Publication

EP 0985887 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99200333 A

Priority

ES 9801906 A

Abstract (en)

The stove top (1) is made of glass, vitroceramic or sheet metal, and includes some through holes for the heat sources (2), whether they are gas and/or electric and besides, the stove top has some ornamental elements (3) that cover said holes. The stove top is characterized in that it comprises a plate (5) that has any type of shape and that it is provided with a through hole (8) for the heat source where it is going to be located, so that the overheating produced by placement of a cooking vessel on the heat source, is eliminated or reduced by placement of said plate (5) located around the source, the plate constituting an element for thermal protection against said overheating. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/10 (2006.01); F24C 15/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/10 (2013.01); F24C 15/36 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985887 A1 20000315; EP 0985887 B1 20040506; DE 69916953 D1 20040609; DE 69916953 T2 20060720; ES 2159456 A1 20011001; ES 2159456 B1 20020401; ES 2222013 T3 20050116; PL 331657 A1 20000313; TR 9900568 A2 20000421; TR 9900568 A3 20000421

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-06-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20150527

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 69916953

- Effective date: 20150402

2015-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050208

2005-02-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2222013 T3

2004-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2004-11-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-10-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2004-08-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916953 P 20040609

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020610

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000911

2000-05-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH FABRICACION, S.A.

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI