Global Patent Index - EP 0985891 A1

EP 0985891 A1 2000-03-15 - Method and device for heating and/or cooling a room

Title (en)

Method and device for heating and/or cooling a room

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Beheizung und/oder Kühlung von Räumen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le chauffage et/ou le refroidissement d'un local

Publication

EP 0985891 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98117338 A

Priority

EP 98117338 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves using flat radiation elements (F1) through which a common heat carrying medium flows that is heated by a heat source (W) and/or cooled by a cold source (K), and passes back to the heat and/or cold source through a common return path (R). The return temp. of the cooling circuit is set above that of the heating circuit for simultaneous heating and cooling. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for heating and/or cooling separate rooms in a building.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Einrichtung zur Beheizung und/oder Kühlung von in mindestens einem Gebäude befindlichen, voneinander getrennten Räumen und/oder von mindestens einem Großraum mit Zonen mit unterschiedlichem Heiz- bzw. Kühlbedarf unter Verwendung von Flächenstrahlelementen, die von einem gemeinsamen Wärmeträgermedium durchströmt werden, das in einer Wärmequelle W erwärmt und/oder in einer Kältequelle K gekühlt wird und das nach Durchströmen der Flächenstrahlelemente F durch einen gemeinsamen Rücklauf R bedarfsweise zur Wärmequelle W und/oder Kältequelle K zurückgeführt wird. Um bei einem derartigen Verfahren die in den Räumen des Gebäudes vorhandene bzw. durch interne oder externe Wärmequellen erzeugte Überschußenergie zur Beheizung bzw. Kühlung auszunutzen und die Vernichtung von Energie zu vermeiden, wird die Rücklauftemperatur des Kühlkreislaufes bei zeitgleichem Heizen und Kühlen auf einen Wert oberhalb der Rücklauftemperatur des Heizkreislaufes ausgelegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 5/00; F24F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 3/10 (2006.01); F24F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 5/0089 (2013.01); F24F 3/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985891 A1 20000315; EP 0985891 B1 20021204; AT 229161 T 20021215; DE 59806545 D1 20030116; DK 0985891 T3 20030324

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150912

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150912

2016-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140917

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140923

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110912

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 229161

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20110912

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100912

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100913

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120401

2012-04-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20120401

2011-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100912

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100912

2011-05-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2011-05-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BEST G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100920

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090925

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-03-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: BEST GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20091215

2010-02-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2009-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090915

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090916

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090915

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BEST GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2009-11-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20091015 AND 20091021

2009-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090910

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ZEHNDER VERKAUFS- UND VERWALTUNGS-AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2006-10-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ZEHNDER VERKAUFS- UND VERWALTUNGS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2004-11-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-10-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ZEHNDER VERKAUFS- UND VERWALTUNGS-AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-03-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-02-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030117

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59806545

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-16

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 229161

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010326

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990406

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI