Global patent index - EP 0985892 A1

EP 0985892 A1 2000-03-15 - Controlling and checking safety aspects of heating systems for liquids utilizing electric heating elements as sensor

Title (en)

Controlling and checking safety aspects of heating systems for liquids utilizing electric heating elements as sensor

Title (de)

Steuerung und Überwachung der Sicherheit einer Flüssigkeitsheizanlage, worin die elektrischen Heizelemente als Sensor gebraucht werden

Title (fr)

Surveillance et contrôle de la sécurité d'une installation de chauffage de liquide, utilisant comme capteur les éléments électriques chauffants

Publication

EP 0985892 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202932 A

Priority

NL 1010064 A

Abstract (en)

The electronic system comprises a microcontroller which provides for the automatic temperature adjustment of solids or liquids, with the heating element being utilized as temperature sensor. Depending on the number of available heating elements, the electronic circuit is expanded with a basic circuit which is built up from two relays with make-and-break contacts by means of which the heating element can be employed for the original purpose or can be connected as a temperature sensor in a measuring bridge. Due to extensive continuous test activities by the microcontroller, the realized system design is very well protected against uncontrolled heating. Also malfunctions in the microcontroller cause the heating activities to be stopped immediately. This renders an excess temperature cut-out switch redundant. Due to the alternating switching order, the two relays are loaded equally over time, which prolongs their lives significantly. The number of switching actions is further limited by performing a number of measurements during heating, so that it can be calculated after how much time the desired temperature will be reached. Just before this time has passed, a small number of measurements are carried out to achieve the final temperature within the desired tolerance. The electronic system makes both the conventional temperature sensor and the heat content sensor redundant. Further, the electronic system can measure the thickness of lime deposition on the heating elements and, depending on the measurement, give a service alarm or cut out the appliance completely. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/2021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985892 A1 20000315; EP 0985892 B1 20040825; DE 69919646 D1 20040930; DE 69919646 T2 20050811; NL 1010064 C2 20000313

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-30 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 69919646

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140917

2014-09-17 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 69919646

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130909

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130909

2014-04-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20140401

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120920

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120920

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2010-05-26 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20100512

2010-05-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100415 AND 20100421

2009-06-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20081115

2009-03-25 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27C

- Effective date: 20081115

2005-10-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: KREIKENBOHM, ROBERT

2005-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: KREIKENBOHM, ROBERT

2005-08-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: KREIKENBOHM, ROBERT

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-08-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-07-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: KREIKENBOHM, ROBERT

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-07-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: KREIKENBOHM, ROBERT

- Effective date: 20050518

2004-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69919646

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-08-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020213

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI