Global Patent Index - EP 0985896 A2

EP 0985896 A2 2000-03-15 - Firearm

Title (en)

Firearm

Title (de)

Feuerwaffe

Title (fr)

Arme à feu

Publication

EP 0985896 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125107 A

Priority

  • DE 19626077 A
  • EP 97109514 A

Abstract (en)

A firing mechanism for a hand gun has a normal setting in which the striker is locked in the cocked position by the recoil of the breech, and is operated in a single fire mode. A slider (61) is moved between the single fire and automatic mode in which it presses down on the catch lever. This allows the striker to swing back from the cocked position as soon as the recoil allows, i.e. an automatic rapid fire setting.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Abzugseinrichtung für eine Selbstladeschußwaffe mit Umstellung auf Dauerfeuer, die einen Hahn (13), einen Verschluß (7), eine Klinke (23), einen schwenkbar angebrachten Abzug (33) und einen Abzugshebel (43) aufweist. Der Abzugshebel (43) greift bei Einzelfeuer nach jedem Schuß, wenn der Abzug noch gezogen ist, in den Hahn (13) ein und hält ihn gespannt. Ist auf Dauerfeuer umgestellt, dann befindet sich der Abzugshebel (43) in einer unwirksamen Stellung, in der er durch ein Eingriffselement (61) festgehalten wird. Das Eingriffselement ist bevorzugt ein Schieber (61), dessen Bewegung von einer Sicherungs- und Feuereinstellwalze (55) gesteuert ist, die im Griffstück (1) drehbar gelagert ist und durch einen Bedienungshebel betätigt werden kann. Zusätzlich oder unabhängig von der obigen Ausbildung sind Teile der Abzugseinrichtung (5) mit ihren Achsen (21, 27, 35) in den Seitenwänden eines Kastens gelagert, der aus Kunststoff besteht und an dessen Unterseite ein Griff (3) einstöckig angesetzt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 19/46; F41A 17/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 3/64 (2006.01); F41A 17/36 (2006.01); F41A 19/14 (2006.01); F41A 19/15 (2006.01); F41A 19/16 (2006.01); F41A 19/45 (2006.01); F41A 19/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 3/64 (2013.01); F41A 17/36 (2013.01); F41A 19/14 (2013.01); F41A 19/15 (2013.01); F41A 19/16 (2013.01); F41A 19/45 (2013.01); F41A 19/46 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0816792 A2 19980107; EP 0816792 A3 19990303; EP 0816792 B1 20010912; AT 205591 T 20010915; AT 311584 T 20051215; DE 19626077 A1 19980108; DE 19626077 C2 20001026; DE 19655169 C2 20030130; DE 59712502 D1 20060105; EP 0985896 A2 20000315; EP 0985896 A3 20000607; EP 0985896 B1 20051130; EP 1530017 A2 20050511; EP 1530017 A3 20051005; ES 2163067 T3 20020116; ES 2253857 T3 20060601; SG 52995 A1 19980928; US 5913261 A 19990615

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100612

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100611

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100611

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100611

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100611

2011-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-01-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110101

2010-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HECKLER & KOCH G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090627

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090731

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090623

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090623

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090622

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090629

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HECKLER & KOCH GMBH

- Free text: HECKLER & KOCH GMBH#ALTE STEIGE 7#78727 OBERNDORF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HECKLER & KOCH GMBH#ALTE STEIGE 7#78727 OBERNDORF (DE)

2006-11-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2253857 T3

2006-03-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060216

2006-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59712502 P 20060105

2005-11-30 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0816792 P

2005-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2005-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-05-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FIREARM

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 41A 19/46 A, 7F 41A 17/36 B, 7F 41A 19/15 B

2000-03-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TRIGGER MECHANISM

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991216

2000-03-15 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 816792

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL