Global Patent Index - EP 0985896 A3

EP 0985896 A3 2000-06-07 - Trigger mechanism

Title (en)

Trigger mechanism

Title (de)

Abzugeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de détente

Publication

EP 0985896 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99125107 A

Priority

  • DE 19626077 A
  • EP 97109514 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0816792A2] The firearm can be changed over between continuous firing and the firing of single rounds, having a hammer (13) with hammer spring and first and second locking notches (17,19), being movable between the released and fully-cocked positions. Rearwards movement of the breech-block (7) cocks the hammer, and controls a continuous-firing mechanism (23) working with the first notch (17). A pivoting trigger (33) spring-loaded into a forward rest position has an engagement lug (39). The trigger lever (43) slides and pivots, and is spring-loaded (53) against the hammer, engaging in the second notch (19) in the latter, releasing it on actuation. After release and re-cocking the spring re-engages it with the second notch. A changeover mechanism (55,61) prevents trigger engagement in this notch, so that the hammer is only actuated by the continuous-firing mechanism, which releases it when the breech is shut. A component (61) of the changeover mechanism engages with the trigger, preventing it moving forwards. The trigger moves for the same distance, whether firing single shots or continuously.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 19/46; F41A 17/36; F41A 19/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 3/64 (2006.01); F41A 17/36 (2006.01); F41A 19/14 (2006.01); F41A 19/15 (2006.01); F41A 19/16 (2006.01); F41A 19/45 (2006.01); F41A 19/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 3/64 (2013.01); F41A 17/36 (2013.01); F41A 19/14 (2013.01); F41A 19/15 (2013.01); F41A 19/16 (2013.01); F41A 19/45 (2013.01); F41A 19/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0816792 A2 19980107; EP 0816792 A3 19990303; EP 0816792 B1 20010912; AT 205591 T 20010915; AT 311584 T 20051215; DE 19626077 A1 19980108; DE 19626077 C2 20001026; DE 19655169 C2 20030130; DE 59712502 D1 20060105; EP 0985896 A2 20000315; EP 0985896 A3 20000607; EP 0985896 B1 20051130; EP 1530017 A2 20050511; EP 1530017 A3 20051005; ES 2163067 T3 20020116; ES 2253857 T3 20060601; SG 52995 A1 19980928; US 5913261 A 19990615

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100612

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100611

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100611

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100611

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100611

2011-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-01-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110101

2010-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HECKLER & KOCH G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090627

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090731

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090623

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090623

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090622

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090629

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HECKLER & KOCH GMBH

- Free text: HECKLER & KOCH GMBH#ALTE STEIGE 7#78727 OBERNDORF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HECKLER & KOCH GMBH#ALTE STEIGE 7#78727 OBERNDORF (DE)

2006-11-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2253857 T3

2006-03-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060216

2006-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59712502 P 20060105

2005-11-30 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0816792 P

2005-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2005-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-05-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FIREARM

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 41A 19/46 A, 7F 41A 17/36 B, 7F 41A 19/15 B

2000-03-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TRIGGER MECHANISM

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991216

2000-03-15 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 816792

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL