Global Patent Index - EP 0985972 A1

EP 0985972 A1 2000-03-15 - Feeding device for photographic material

Title (en)

Feeding device for photographic material

Title (de)

Antriebseinrichtung für Fotomaterial

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transport pour matériau photographique

Publication

EP 0985972 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98117186 A

Priority

EP 98117186 A

Abstract (en)

A transport system for film and photographic paper through a processing system has transport rollers (100) driven with a surface speed greater than that of the film feed. The speed can be adjusted to slightly greater than the film feed speed, or it can be sufficiently fast to cater for fluctuations in the film feed speed. The rollers have grooves to hold contact rings (110) which reduce the contact area with the film/paper.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Fotomaterial-Antriebseinrichtung zum Treiben von Fotomaterial entlang eines Transportpfades, insbesondere zum Treiben von Fotopapier durch eine Fotoentwicklungsmaschine, mit mindestens einem Antriebsrotor (100), dessen rotierende Oberfläche (110) durch Kontakt mit dem Fotomaterial Antriebskraft auf das Fotomaterial zum Transport überträgt, wobei am Ort des Kontakts die Umfangsgeschwindigkeit der rotierenden Oberfläche schneller ist als die Transportgeschwindigkeit des Fotomaterials. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03D 3/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03D 3/08 (2006.01); G03D 3/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03D 3/132 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985972 A1 20000315; CA 2283053 A1 20000310; JP 2000098570 A 20000407

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031230

2002-09-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMIP LLC

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI