Global Patent Index - EP 0985982 A1

EP 0985982 A1 2000-03-15 - Laser printing device comprising a spiral regulating blade

Title (en)

Laser printing device comprising a spiral regulating blade

Title (de)

Laser Druckvorrichtung mit einer spiralförmiger Dosierklinge

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'impression laser à lame régulatrice serpentine

Publication

EP 0985982 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402119 A

Priority

FR 9811248 A

Abstract (en)

Toner contained in a tank (3) is transferred to a printing drum (1) by a feeding wheel (11) and spreading wheel (4). The thickness of the toner on the spreading wheel is controlled by a regulator (13) which consists of a helical elastic coil (17) in contact with the spreading wheel surface and with an axis which is parallel to that of the spreading wheel. Coil contact is maintained by a row of springs (15)

Abstract (fr)

Le dispositif comprend un réservoir (3) de toner (6), un tambour photosensible d'impression (1), un rouleau de développement (4), destiné à appliquer du toner (6) sur le tambour (1), un organe régulateur (13), s'étendant le long d'une génératrice d'appui (16) du rouleau de développement (4) et destiné à réguler l'épaisseur du toner (6) sur le rouleau de développement (4), et des ressorts (15) de poussée de l'organe régulateur (13) vers le rouleau de développement (4). L'organe régulateur (13) est un organe serpentin, élastiquement déformable, destiné à épouser la forme du rouleau de développement (4) le long de ladite génératrice d'appui (16). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/0812 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4406536 A 19830927 - SUZUKI KOHJI [JP], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 260 (P - 1056) 5 June 1990 (1990-06-05)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 361 (P - 917) 11 August 1989 (1989-08-11)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 243 (P - 1364) 4 June 1992 (1992-06-04)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 098, no. 008 30 June 1998 (1998-06-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 158 (P - 1027) 27 March 1990 (1990-03-27)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985982 A1 20000315; FR 2782947 A1 20000310; FR 2782947 B1 20001103

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030301

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI