Global patent index - EP 0985984 A1

EP 0985984 A1 2000-03-15 - Actuating device for a mechanism in a non-circular watch case

Title (en)

Actuating device for a mechanism in a non-circular watch case

Title (de)

Betätigungsvorrichtung für einen Mechanismus in einem nicht kreisförmigen Uhrengehäuse

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'actionnement d'un mécanisme pour boîte de montre de forme non circulaire

Publication

EP 0985984 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98117141 A

Priority

EP 98117141 A

Abstract (en)

Push buttons (4a,4b) provide on, off and reset control to a circular stopwatch mechanism (16) in a square watchcase (2). When the push buttons are pressed their movement parallel to the 3 hour/9 hour line is transmitted to mechanism pistons (18a,18b) acting along mechanism radii (D2,D3) through rigid levers (22a,22b) which are pivoted by flat headed screws (28a,28b).

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif d'actionnement d'un mécanisme d'une pièce d'horlogerie, notamment un mécanisme de chronographe, comportant un cercle d'encageage (12) ayant une ouverture (14) apte à recevoir un mouvement (16), un bouton-poussoir (4a, 4b) indépendant coulissant selon une première direction (D1), un piston (18a, 18b) coulissant selon une deuxième direction (D2, D3) dans le cercle d'encageage (12), ledit piston (18a, 18b) étant destiné à coopérer avec un organe du mouvement (16) et un organe de transmission de poussée pour transmettre une poussée dudit bouton-poussoir (4a, 4b) audit piston (18a, 18b), caractérisé en ce que l'organe de transmission de poussée comprend un levier d'actionnement rigide (22a, 22b) articulé en un point (P) sur le cercle d'encageage (12) et dans le plan de ce dernier. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 3/048 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

CH 211143 A 19400831 - SCHMITZ WERNER [CH]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985984 A1 20000315; CN 1247335 A 20000315; US 6247841 B1 20010619

INPADOC legal status

2001-09-19 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20010723

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010608

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE GB IT LI

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI