Global Patent Index - EP 0985997 A3

EP 0985997 A3 2000-07-05 - Thin structure information processing apparatus

Title (en)

Thin structure information processing apparatus

Title (de)

Informationsverarbeitungsgerät von dünner Struktur

Title (fr)

Appareil de traitement d'information de structure mince

Publication

EP 0985997 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99123913 A

Priority

  • EP 97304844 A
  • JP 28238596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0838749A1] A thin structure information processing apparatus includes a body (1) which has a substantially planar structure and accommodating therein at least a main board (2); a power supply board (3); a built-in battery (4); and a built-in hard disk drive (5). The main board, the power supply board, the built-in battery and the built-in hard disk drive are arranged in such a manner they are not overlapped with each other with respect to a plane of the substantially planar structure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 1/1616 (2013.01); G06F 1/1656 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5132876 A 19920721 - MA HSI K [TW]
  • [A] "BUILDING BLOCK CONCEPT FOR NOTEBOOK PERSONAL COMPUTER", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, vol. 38, no. 10, 1 October 1995 (1995-10-01), pages 521 - 522, XP000540580, ISSN: 0018-8689
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 327 (P - 1757) 21 June 1994 (1994-06-21)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0838749 A1 19980429; EP 0838749 B1 20021016; CN 1145895 C 20040414; CN 1180868 A 19980506; DE 69716374 D1 20021121; DE 69716374 T2 20030220; DE 69718521 D1 20030220; DE 69718521 T2 20030731; DE 69718522 D1 20030220; DE 69718522 T2 20030731; DE 69739427 D1 20090709; EP 0985996 A2 20000315; EP 0985996 A3 20000705; EP 0985996 B1 20030115; EP 0985997 A2 20000315; EP 0985997 A3 20000705; EP 0985997 B1 20030115; EP 1246046 A1 20021002; EP 1246046 B1 20090527; EP 2077480 A1 20090708; JP H10124174 A 19980515; US 6014311 A 20000111

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100703

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69718522

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100703

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090626

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090701

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090710

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-09-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69718522 P 20030220

2003-01-15 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 838749

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-01-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001023

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 838749

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI