Global Patent Index - EP 0986030 B1

EP 0986030 B1 2001-02-21 - Electronic coin selector

Title (en)

Electronic coin selector

Title (de)

Elektronischer Münzsortierer

Title (fr)

Sélecteur électronique de pièces de monnaie

Publication

EP 0986030 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98118878 A

Priority

  • JP 23483698 A
  • ZA 9809198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0986030A1] It is provided an electronic coin selector, which comprises at least means (21, 22, 23) for detecting an inserted coin electronically to obtain data, means (36) for storing key data (41) which relate to a key in the form of a coin, and means (35) for comparing the data of the inserted coin and the key data (41) to judge whether the inserted coin is a key coin. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 5/08 (2006.01); G07D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0986030 A1 20000315; EP 0986030 B1 20010221; JP 2000036067 A 20000202; JP 4171828 B2 20081029; ZA 9809198 B 19990630

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111006

2012-08-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69800534

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111006

2012-05-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120501

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20101013

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800534 20010329

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB NL

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990416

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI